Mann, Stephen Michael (CPSO#: 88757)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Orthopaedics
Nickle 3, Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3670
Fax: (613) 548-2468
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen M. Mann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mann ( CPSO# 88757 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Orthopaedics
Nickle 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN MICHAEL MANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013