Manocha, Anoop (CPSO#: 78437)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 12 Aug 2002 to 01 Sep 2002
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2002