Manogaran, Mansula (CPSO#: 82051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Bergen, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
RVH - Centenary Hospital
Suite 303
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (647) 436-3397
Fax: (647) 436-3403
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mansula Manogaran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Manogaran ( CPSO# 82051 )

Business Address:
303 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (647) 436-3397

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANSULA MANOGARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOGARAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2004