Manohar, Advaitanand (CPSO#: 72569)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Manohar, A Vaito (used until: 01 Dec 2016 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7A 7700 Pine Valley Drive
Woodbridge ON  L4L 2X4
Phone: (905) 851-1234
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.V. Manohar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 8 2006


Corporation Name: A Manohar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Manohar ( CPSO# 72569 )

Business Address:
Suite 7A
7700 Pine Valley Drive
Woodbridge ON  L4L 2X4
Phone Number: (905) 851-1234

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADVAITANAND MANOHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2005
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 05 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2016

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Oct 2006
Summary:

 On October 5, 2006, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
 found that Dr. A Vaito Manohar to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he 
 sexually abused a patient, engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine 
 that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, and that he engaged in conduct unbecoming a 
 physician.  The Discipline Committee ordered and directed:

 

1.                  Directs the 
 Registrar to revoke Dr. Manohar(s certificate of registration effective 	         
 	immediately.

2.                  Requires that Dr. Manohar appear before the panel to be 
 reprimanded.

3.                  Requires that Dr. Manohar reimburse the College for funding 
 provided for the 	         	complainant under the program required under section 85.7 of the 
 Code.

4.                  Requires Dr. Manohar to post security acceptable to the College to 
 guarantee the 	        	 payment of any amounts Dr. Manohar may be required to reimburse the 
 College 	         	pursuant to paragraph 3 above.

5.                  Requires Dr. Manohar to pay 
 costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 05, 2006

Application for Reinstatement   Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
Decision Date: 18 Jun 2014
Decision: Application Accepted