Manokaran, Kamini (CPSO#: 87787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Mar 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (647) 347-2401
Fax: (647) 347-2801
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamini Manokaran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Manokaran ( CPSO# 87787 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (647) 347-2401

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 05 Aug 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 10 Oct 2007 to 07 Nov 2007
PEAP - Resident - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 08 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 16 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 17 Feb 2009 to 23 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 09 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Kamini Manokaran may practise medicine independently in Rheumatology in an
            office setting, only.