Manser, Courtney Anne (CPSO#: 90602)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: Mahler, Courtney Anne (used until: 30 Oct 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Palliative Shared Care Team
Prince Charles Medical Centre
555 Prince Charles Drive, 2nd Floor
Welland ON  L3C 6B5
Phone: 905-735-1701
Fax: (905) 735-1703
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Port Colborne Hospital
260 Sugerloaf Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 2N7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

5050 Jepson Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 1K5
Canada
Phone: 905-356-1221
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Manser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Manser ( CPSO# 90602 )

Business Address:
5050 Jepson Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 1K5
Phone Number: (905) 356-1221

Business Address:
Harrison Hall
Student Health Services
500 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Phone Number: (905) 688-5550

Business Address:
Port Colborne Hospital
260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 2N7
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COURTNEY ANNE MANSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011