Mansfield, Gary Joel (CPSO#: 25626)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 14 Feb 2008

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jan 2006

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: November 8, 2005
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On March 23, 2006, the College withdrew the allegations against Dr. Mansfield as he signed an
undertaking as follows:

On November 8, 2005, Dr. Mansfield entered into the following undertaking:

1. I, Dr. Gary Joel Mansfield, undertake to resign from the College of Physicians and
Surgeons of Ontario, no later than January 31, 2006, and in the interim agree to continue
to comply with the terms of the interim order dated November 26, 2004.

2. I, Dr. Gary Joel Mansfield, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a
physician or for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.

3. I, Dr. Gary Joel Mansfield, consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the
register as information that is available to the public.

4. I Dr. Gary Joel Mansfield, acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario agrees to withdraw the referral to the
Discipline Committee for sexual abuse and disgraceful dishonourable and unprofessional
conduct, as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated November 3, 2004.

5. I Dr. Gary Joel Mansfield agree that, in the event that the College of Physicians and
Surgeons of Ontario should become aware that I have either applied, re-applied or
attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise
medicine in any jurisdiction, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario shall, in
its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a discipline proceeding on the basis of
this undertaking and, if successfully, shall have the right to proceed with the prosecution
of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated November 3, 2004.

6. I, Dr. Gary Joel Mansfield, hereby agree to bear the risk of any prejudice that the passage
of time might cause to my ability to make full answer and defence, and waive the right to
seek any remedy on the basis of the passage of time, should the College of Physicians
and Surgeons of Ontario proceed with the prosecution of the allegations contained in the
Notice of Hearing dated November 3, 2004 pursuant to paragraph 5 of this undertaking.

7. I, Dr. Gary Joel Mansfield, by entering into this undertaking, do not agree with any of the
allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated November 3, 2004.

8. I, Dr. Gary Joel Mansfield, acknowledge that I have obtained independent legal advice
before giving this undertaking.