Mansour, Ali Ali Abdulla (CPSO#: 91299)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Feb 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4 - 751 Don Mills Rd
Toronto ON  M3C 1S3
Phone: (647) 350-3030
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Mansour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 4 2017


Corporation Name: A. Mansour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mansour ( CPSO# 91299 )

Business Address:
751 Don Mills Road
Unit 4
Toronto ON  M3C 1S3
Phone Number: (647) 350-3030

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 12 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 27 Jul 2016
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 27 Jul 2016
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 27 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 27 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:30 p.m., July 27, 2016, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ali
            Ali Abdulla Mansour:

            (a)   Dr. Mansour shall not delegate any acts or any care of any patients to
                  any unregulated health professional. 

            (b)   Dr. Mansour shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully
                  complete the following educational courses:

                  i.    Ontario College of Family Physicians course entitled "Practising
                        Wisely" within six months from the date of this order; and
                  
                  ii.   Individualized instruction in ethics approved by the College at the
                        instructor's earliest availability. Dr. Mansour will provide proof
                        of successful completion within three (3) weeks of completing the
                        instruction. The instruction will involve one-on-one sessions with
                        a College-approved instructor, incorporating principles of guided
                        reflection, tailored feedback, and other modalities customized to
                        the specific needs of Dr. Mansour as assessed by the instructor.
                        The instructor will report to the College regarding Dr. Mansour's
                        progress and compliance. 
                  
            (c)   Dr. Mansour shall retain a clinical supervisor, approved by the College,
                  who will sign an undertaking in the form attached hereto as Appendix "A"
                  (the "Supervisor") no later than 30 days prior to Dr. Mansour's return to
                  practice after the suspension referred to in paragraph 4 above.  Dr.
                  Mansour shall practice under the guidance of the Supervisor for a period
                  of six (6) months.  Dr. Mansour shall meet with the Supervisor monthly to
                  discuss any concerns related to patient care.

            (d)   Within six (6) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision,
                  Dr. Mansour will submit to a reassessment of his practice (the
                  "Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the
                  "Assessor(s)").  The Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                  observation of Dr. Mansour's care, interviews with colleagues and
                  co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary
                  by the College.  The Reassessment shall be at Dr. Mansour's expense and
                  he shall co-operate with all elements of the Reassessment. Dr. Mansour
                  shall abide by all recommendations made by the Assessor(s) subject to
                  paragraph (e) below, and the results of the Reassessment will be reported
                  to the College and may form the basis of further action by the College.

            (e)   If Dr. Mansour is of the view that any of the Assessor(s)'s
                  recommendations are unreasonable, he will have fifteen (15) days
                  following his receipt of the recommendations within which to provide the
                  College with his submissions in this regard.  The Inquiries Complaints
                  and Reports ("ICR") Committee will consider those submissions and make a
                  determination regarding whether the recommendations are reasonable, and
                  that decision will be provided to Dr. Mansour. Following that decision
                  Dr. Mansour will abide by those recommendations of the Assessor(s) that
                  the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 

            (f)   Dr. Mansour shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of his practice location(s) and and to any other activity the
                  College deems necessary in order to monitor his compliance with the
                  provisions of this Order. 

            (g)   Dr. Mansour shall comply with the College Policy on Practice Management
                  Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an Extended
                  Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation in respect of
                  his period of suspension, a copy of which forms Appendix "B" to this
                  Order. 

            (h)   Dr. Mansour shall inform the College of each and every location where he
                  practices, in any jurisdiction (his "Practice Location(s)") within
                  fifteen (15) days of this Order, and shall inform the College of any and
                  all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing
                  practice at that location, until the report of the assessment of his
                  practice have been reported to the College.

            (i)   Dr. Mansour shall consent to the College making appropriate enquiries of
                  the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person who or institution
                  that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor
                  his compliance with this Order.

            (j)   Dr. Mansour shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with
                  implementing the terms of this Order.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Jul 2016
Summary:

On  July  27,  2016, the  Discipline  Committee  of  the  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of 
Ontario  found  that Dr.  Ali  Ali  Abdulla  Mansour has  committed  an  act  of  professional 
misconduct in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable, or unprofessional and in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of 
the profession.  
 
Dr. Mansour, a family physician, practised at the Parliament Walk-In Clinic located at 1 Oak 
Street in downtown Toronto, Ontario (the “Clinic”).  
 
On July 30, 2013, the College received an anonymous call from a physician who indicated she 
had concerns with Dr. Mansour’s use of a PA, namely, that a PA was seeing and treating patients 
without proper supervision, while Dr. Mansour was not in the clinic and was in fact on vacation. 
The College launched a section 75(1)(a) investigation into Dr. Mansour’s practice in August 
2013 after receiving this information. 
 
On August 14, 2013, representatives of the College attended unannounced at the Clinic and 
spoke with the receptionist, the PA, and the Clinic Manager. Dr. Mansour was not present.  
 
The receptionist said Dr. Mansour was away for a month and that Dr. Mansour’s PA was seeing 
patients with no physician on the premises. The PA initially denied any knowledge of Dr. 
Mansour being out of the country on vacation, saying she understood Dr. Mansour was not in the 
clinic that day because he was home sick.  
 
Once the PA was told that the College understood Dr. Mansour was away, the PA said Dr. 
Mansour was in Libya and had been gone for a month. The PA also said that she was working on 
her regularly scheduled days in Dr. Mansour’s absence, and did not work under the supervision 
of any other physician. She worked only under the supervision of Dr. Mansour. She stated that 
she communicated electronically with Dr. Mansour about any difficult cases. The PA confirmed 
Dr. Mansour had remote access to the patient records and could look at them (with the exception 
of lab results) and discuss the plan with her. If she was ordering medication, she would enter the 
medications into the electronic record and print it out, then use a stamp of Dr. Mansour’s.  She 
would not prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs. Some of the patients she would see were walk-
in patients and did not have an established physician-patient relationship with Dr. Mansour.  
 
Around August 14, 2013, Dr. Mansour spoke on the telephone with a College representative and 
said that he was sick and therefore had been unable to go to work that day. Dr. Mansour states 
that this telephone conversation took place after Dr. Mansour spoke with the Clinic Manager, 
during which the Clinic Manager advised Dr. Mansour he ought not to have let the PA see 
patients in his absence, among other things. Dr. Mansour states that he panicked and told the 
College representative he was not at the Clinic because he was sick.  In actuality, Dr. Mansour 
was out of the country at that time. 
 
On March 26, 2014, the College requested various documents and information pertaining to 
when Dr. Mansour was on vacation/out of the country, where he was during that period, and 
copies of any supporting documentation, as well as dates when the PA worked at the clinic and 
information about what Dr. Mansour billed OHIP during that period from Dr. Mansour’s 
counsel. 
 
Dr. Mansour advised the College he was checking his records regarding where he was in July 
and August of 2013, and whether bills were submitted to OHIP during this time period, and 
would write again once this information had been compiled.  
 
On May 13, 2014, Dr. Mansour told the College he had not found any records documenting 
where he was in July and August of 2013, and that his recollection was that he was in Libya from 
July 3 to 8, 2013, and in Turkey from August 9 to 15 or 16, 2013. He told the College that his PA 
worked at the clinic for 3 days in July and 4 days in August while he was away. Dr. Mansour 
further advised he was in Turkey when he spoke with the College representative on August 14, 
2013, that he had “panicked and spoke without thinking first” and that he “is very anxious about 
this issue and until now has not known how to make things right.”  
 
Dr. Mansour also told the College that he billed OHIP when he was out of the country and his 
PA was seeing patients, should not have done so, and was conducting a self-audit of these 
amounts in order to repay OHIP. 
 
On May 23, 2014, the College wrote to Dr. Mansour’s counsel requesting clarification about 
where Dr. Mansour was between July 9 and August 8, 2013. On June 3, 2014, Dr. Mansour’s 
counsel told the College that Dr. Mansour was in Ontario between July 9 and August 8, 2013 and 
was in Toronto on any day on which he was scheduled to work during that time period. 
 
The College then asked Dr. Mansour to attend at the College with his passport and any other 
supporting documents to verify he was in Ontario between July 9 and August 8, 2013. The 
College sent a further letter dated July 24, 2014, requesting confirmation of a date upon which 
Dr. Mansour could attend the College, and a further request on August 7, 2014. 
 
Dr. Mansour’s counsel wrote to the College on August 7, 2014, saying that Dr. Mansour was in 
Libya and his return to Canada had been delayed. Counsel advised Dr. Mansour would not be in 
a position to provide the requested documents until his return, which was expected on August 10, 
2014. Counsel further advised dates upon which Dr. Mansour was available to attend at the 
CPSO for an interview by the Medical Inspector. 
 
Dr. Mansour’s counsel told the College in an August 14, 2014 letter that Dr. Mansour had had to 
surrender his Libyan passport (which he used for his trip in July/August 2013) when he changed 
to a Canadian passport. Counsel also provided the billing and medication records requested by 
the College. 
 
Dr. Mansour’s counsel told the College in a September 22, 2014 letter that the information 
previously provided to the College by Dr. Mansour was incorrect in the following ways:  i) Dr. 
Mansour had not surrendered his Libyan passport; and ii) Dr. Mansour was in Libya and Turkey 
continuously between July 5 and August 15, 2013, returning to Canada on August 16, 2013. He 
was not in Ontario between July 9 and August 8, 2013 as previously advised. Enclosed with the 
letter was a copy of Dr. Mansour’s Libyan passport used in 2013. Dr. Mansour apologized 
through his counsel for having provided inaccurate information in the past and indicated that, 
having now shared the information about his whereabouts, he was eager to fully cooperate with 
the College’s investigation. 
 
The College interviewed the PA, who confirmed she saw patients at the Clinic without Dr. 
Mansour being present, at his request. The PA advised she initially worked under verbal orders 
from Dr. Mansour, and that she created Medical Directives later, and sent them to the Clinic for 
its use. Dr. Mansour confirms this is true. 
 
The PA had graduated from a PA program at McMaster University in 2012, and started working 
with Dr. Mansour, in about May, 2013. Dr. Mansour spent a couple of weeks seeing patients 
with her, assessing her skills, and discussing cases and patient management with her in breaks 
between seeing patients. 
 
The PA told the College that Dr. Mansour personally asked her to see patients when he was not 
there. 
 
When Dr. Mansour was away in July and August 2013, he directed the PA to contact him if she 
needed him. The PA told the College that at no time did Dr. Mansour discourage the PA from 
contacting him to discuss patient care and that she was usually able to reach him.  
 
After a self-audit, Dr. Mansour repaid $16,734.32 to the Ministry of Health and Long-Term Care 
in respect of billings made in relation to patient visits in the months of July and August 2013, 
where the patients were seen by the PA but not by Dr. Mansour. 
 
STANDARD OF PRACTICE 
 
A College-retained expert opined that Dr. Mansour failed to meet the standards of practice in the 
following respects: 
   -  His use of a PA fell below the standard of care in respect of 19 patients, primarily with 
      respect to supervision and delegation. The criteria for delegation were met in only one 
      chart. These deficiencies could expose his patients to harm. 
   -  His medical documentation fell below the standard of care in respect of 15 to 17 patients. 
      In some cases, there were notes which appeared to be copied and pasted in patient charts. 
   -  The care provided demonstrated concerns about his knowledge and judgment in almost 
      all charts reviewed. In various files, this related to one or more of timely or appropriate 
      follow-up of abnormal test results, lack of knowledge of current guidelines, and over-
      extensive investigations without apparent clinical reasoning documented or explained. 
 
Dr. Mansour responded to the expert’s report and said that he had not used a PA in his practice 
since these issues arose in August 2013. Dr. Mansour told the College that he has since 
completed the U of T medical record keeping course and had become more comfortable with the 
Clinic’s EMR system. He told the College that, in response to Dr. Walker’s concerns about his 
knowledge of various guidelines, Dr. Mansour reviewed five CPSO policies, as well as a number 
of clinical guidelines. Dr. Mansour also told the College had registered to take a course on 
diabetes management and a review course in internal medicine and had performed a self-audit 
and repaid to OHIP the amounts he billed during the times he was not present at the Clinic. Dr. 
Mansour completed the Medical Record Keeping course at the University of Toronto in 
November 2014. 
 
 
PENALTY AND COSTS 

The Committee ordered and directed that: 

   -  Dr. Mansour to appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 

   -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Mansour’s certificate of registration for a period of nine (9) 
      months commencing immediately. 

   -  The  Registrar  to  place  the  following  terms,  conditions  and  limitations,  effective 
      immediately, on Dr. Mansour’s certificate of registration:  

      Restriction 
      (a)   Dr.  Mansour  shall not  delegate  any  acts  or  any  care  of  any  patients  to  any 
            unregulated health professional.  

      Education 
      (b)   Dr. Mansour shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully complete 
            the following educational courses: 
             i.   Ontario College of Family Physicians course entitled “Practising Wisely” 
                  within six months from the date of this order; and 
             ii.  Individualized  instruction  in  ethics  approved  by  the  College  at  the 
                  instructor’s  earliest  availability.  Dr.  Mansour  will provide  proof  of 
                  successful  completion  within  three  (3)  weeks of  completing  the 
                  instruction. The  instruction will  involve  one-on-one  sessions  with  a 
                  College-approved instructor, incorporating principles of guided reflection, 
                  tailored feedback, and other modalities customized to the specific needs of 
                  Dr. Mansour as assessed by the instructor.  The instructor will report to the 
                  College regarding Dr. Mansour’s progress and compliance.  
      Clinical Supervision & Re-Assessment 
      (c)   Dr. Mansour shall retain a clinical supervisor, approved by the College, who will 
            sign  an  undertaking  in  the  form  attached  hereto  as Appendix “A” (the 
            “Supervisor”) no later than 30 days prior to Dr. Mansour’s return to practice after 
            the suspension referred to in paragraph 4 above.  Dr. Mansour shall practice under 
            the guidance of the Supervisor for a period of six (6) months.  Dr. Mansour shall 
            meet with the Supervisor monthly to discuss any concerns related to patient care.  

      (d)   Within  six  (6)  months  after  the  completion  of  the  Clinical  Supervision,  Dr. 
            Mansour will submit to a reassessment of his practice (the “Reassessment”) by an 
            assessor  or  assessors  selected  by  the  College  (the  “Assessor(s)”).    The 
            Reassessment may include a chart review, direct  observation of Dr. Mansour’s 
         care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any 
         other tools deemed necessary by the College.  The Reassessment shall be at Dr. 
         Mansour’s expense and he shall co-operate with all elements of the Reassessment. 
         Dr. Mansour shall abide by all recommendations made by the Assessor(s) subject 
         to paragraph (e) below, and the results of the Reassessment will be reported to the 
         College and may form the basis of further action by the College. 

   (e)   If Dr. Mansour is of the view that any of the Assessor(s)’s recommendations are 
         unreasonable, he will  have fifteen  (15) days  following his receipt  of  the 
         recommendations within  which  to  provide  the  College  with his submissions  in 
         this  regard.  The Inquiries Complaints  and Reports  (“ICR”) Committee will 
         consider those submissions  and  make  a determination  regarding  whether  the 
         recommendations  are  reasonable,  and  that  decision  will  be  provided  to Dr. 
         Mansour. Following  that decision Dr.  Mansour will  abide  by  those 
         recommendations of the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are 
         reasonable.  

   Other 

   (f)   Dr. Mansour shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of 
         his practice location(s) and and to any other activity the College deems necessary 
         in order to monitor his compliance with the provisions of this Order.  

   (g)   Dr. Mansour  shall  comply  with the  College  Policy  on  Practice  Management 
         Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an Extended Leave of 
         Absence  or  Close  Their  Practice  Due  to  Relocation  in  respect  of  his  period  of 
         suspension, a copy of which forms Appendix “B” to this Order.  
   (h)   Dr.  Mansour  shall  inform  the  College  of  each  and  every location  where  he 
         practices, in any jurisdiction (his “Practice Location(s)”) within fifteen (15) days 
         of this Order, and shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations 
         within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location, until the report 
         of the assessment of his practice have been reported to the College. 

   (i)   Dr.  Mansour  shall  consent  to  the  College  making  appropriate  enquiries  of  the 
         Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person who or institution that may have 
         relevant information, in order for the College to monitor his compliance with this 
         Order. 

   (j)   Dr.  Mansour  shall  be  responsible  for  any  and  all  costs  associated  with 
         implementing the terms of this Order. 

-  That Dr. Mansour to pay to the College costs in the amount of $5,000.00, within 30 days 
   of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): July 27, 2016