Mansouri, Seyed Alireza (CPSO#: 95950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Persian

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Surgical Oncology
610 University Avenue
OPG Wing 6th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: 4165431215
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maryland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEYED ALIREZA MANSOURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSOURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017