Mansouri, Shireen Melinda (CPSO#: 68078)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 1998