Manzig, Loraine Alexandra (CPSO#: 62216)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone: (416) 485-9044
Fax: (416) 485-8525
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Sliwowicz and Dr. Loraine Manzig Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sliwowicz ( CPSO# 57766 )
Dr. L. Manzig ( CPSO# 62216 )

Business Address:
2401 Yonge Street
Suite 215
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone Number: (416) 932-3100

Business Address:
2401 Yonge Street
Suite 210
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone Number: (416) 485-9044

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3947

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORAINE ALEXANDRA MANZIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANZIG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1992