Manzoor, Shaheen Sadrudin (CPSO#: 93365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Health Center
16-2555 Erin Centre Blvd
Mississauga ON  L5M 5H1
Phone: (905) 828-0270
Fax: (905) 828-0277
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manzoor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Manzoor ( CPSO# 93365 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Health Center
16-2555 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5M 5H1
Phone Number: (905) 828-0270

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHEEN SADRUDIN MANZOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANZOOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 06 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2013