Mar, Melanie Christa Pearl (CPSO#: 79106)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 789-4377
Fax: (705) 789-1640
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melanie Mar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mar ( CPSO# 79106 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 789-4377

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jan 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE CHRISTA PEARL MAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 06 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 07 Feb 2005 to 18 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2006