Maragh, Krishna Kumar (CPSO#: 94548)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Central Alberta Orthopedics
Suite 300
4309 52 Avenue
Red Deer AB  T4N 6S4
Phone: (403) 309-2001
Fax: (403) 358-5808

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISHNA KUMAR MARAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARAGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2010