Maranda, Claude Ronald (CPSO#: 33768)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Nov 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hawkesbury General Hospital
1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3E5
Phone: (613) 632-1111 Ext. 51212
Fax: (613) 632-5126
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDE RONALD MARANDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARANDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1971 to 30 Jun 1972
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1972 to 30 Jun 1973
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Sep 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2001