Maranda, Julie Patricia (CPSO#: 72244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hawkesbury & District General
Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone: (613) 632-1111 Ext. 31000
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 101
361 Main Street East
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 1A8
Canada
Phone: (613) 632-5331
Fax: (613) 632-7073
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie Maranda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Maranda ( CPSO# 72244 )

Business Address:
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5

Business Address:
Suite 101
361 Main Street East
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 1A8
Phone Number: (613) 632-0605

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE PATRICIA MARANDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARANDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000