Maranda, Robert Claude (CPSO#: 76313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 738-1584
Fax: (613) 738-9097
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

60 Cambridge Street North
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Canada
Phone: 613-562-6262 Ext. 2023
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3E5
Canada
Phone: 613-632-1111
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

1924-5929 Jeanne D'Arc Blvd South
Orleans ON  K1C 6V8
Canada
Phone: (613) 749-5421
Fax: (613) 830-8211
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Maranda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Minorgan ( CPSO# 76223 )
Dr. R. Maranda ( CPSO# 76313 )

Business Address:
60 Cambridge Street North
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Business Address:
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Business Address:
Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 738-1584

Business Address:
1924 - 5929 Jeanne D'Arc Boulevard South
Ottawa ON  K1C 6V8
Phone Number: (613) 749-5421

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT CLAUDE MARANDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARANDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 02 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 03 Nov 2017

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Jun 2017
Summary:

On June 15, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Maranda committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Maranda is a cardiologist practising in Ottawa. He received his certificate of registration 
authorizing independent practice in Ontario in 2005 and his specialist qualification in cardiology 
in 2007. In the relevant years, Dr. Maranda held privileges at The Ottawa Hospital.   
 
Also, in the relevant years, Dr. Maranda was an assistant professor and an “ePorfolio” group 
leader at the Faculty of Medicine at a University. 
 
Disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct 
  
Ms A was a student in Dr. Maranda’s ePortfolio group. Dr. Maranda’s role as group leader 
involved meeting with the group of students approximately twice a year to discuss issues 
associated with the process of completing medical school and preparing their e-portfolios.    
 
Each student in the group had to submit a draft final ePortfolio posting by the required deadline. 
The ePortfolio class was to be graded by Dr. Maranda on a pass-fail basis. A student would 
receive a “pass” so long as the student submitted the required postings.  
 
Ms A requested an extension of time for submitting her draft posting. She explained to Dr. 
Maranda that she was experiencing personal difficulties following the end of a relationship. Dr. 
Maranda granted the extension. Later, Dr. Maranda offered to meet with Ms A to offer 
supportive advice.    
  
Dr. Maranda and Ms A went for drinks and food and discussed Ms A’s personal issues as well as 
her progress in obtaining a residency placement. Following their meeting, Ms A texted Dr. 
Maranda to thank him. Their communications became more frequent and personal after that 
time.   
 
Dr. Maranda and Ms A arranged to meet at a pub again a few weeks later. Following their 
meeting, they returned to Ms A’s apartment and a sexual encounter took place. The next day, Dr. 
Maranda and Ms A texted back and forth. After several days, Ms A stopped communicating with 
Dr. Maranda, who continued to send her messages for a few days. 
 
Subsequently, Ms A submitted a complaint about Dr. Maranda to the University.   
 
Dr. Maranda was advised that he was to have no contact with learners, pending review of Ms A’s 
complaint by the University’s Professionalism Investigation Committee (the “PIC”). The PIC 
concluded that Dr. Maranda engaged in a personal relationship with a student and that the 
relationship constituted a breach in professionalism. Although the PIC recommended a 
supervised reintegration into the learning environment over the course of three years, Dr. 
Maranda’s academic appointment at the University was terminated. 
 
Dr. Maranda  subsequently resigned his privileges at the Ottawa Hospital. 
 
On June 15, 2017, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-  The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Maranda’s 
   Certificate of Registration: 
    a) At his own expense, Dr. Maranda shall successfully complete the next available course 
       in Understanding Boundaries at Western University within 6 months of the date of this 
       Order 
-  Dr. Maranda appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Maranda pay costs to the College for a one day hearing in the amount of $5,500.00 
   within 30 days of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): June 15, 2017