Marchie, Alfonse (CPSO#: 93623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1822 Whites Road Unit 9
Pickering ON  L1V 4M1
Phone: 905-492-4299
Fax: 416-551-6944
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marchie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Marchie ( CPSO# 93623 )

Business Address:
1822 Whites Road
Unit 9
Pickering ON  L1V 4M1
Phone Number: (905) 492-4299

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 05 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALFONSE MARCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCHIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2017