Marchie, Anthony (CPSO#: 81129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2-9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone: (905) 237-8445
Fax: (905) 237-8446
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Marchie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Marchie ( CPSO# 81129 )

Business Address:
Pinnacle Health Sciences Centre
9651 Yonge Street
Suite 2
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone Number: (905) 237-8445

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY MARCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCHIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009