Marchington, Katie Lee (CPSO#: 90836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
McLaughlin, 8-433
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 3434
Fax: (416) 603-5315
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kensington Hospice
38 Major Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2L1
Canada
Phone: (416) 963-9640
Fax: (416) 963-9466
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATIE LEE MARCHINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCHINGTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 15 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012