Marchuk, Graeme George (CPSO#: 82326)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
1064 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A4
Phone: (877) 701-5181
Fax: (800) 803-9043
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graeme Marchuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Marchuk ( CPSO# 82326 )

Business Address:
200 - 1064 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A4
Phone Number: (877) 701-5181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAEME GEORGE MARCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCHUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Elective Trainee - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2006 to 30 Jul 2006
Elective Trainee - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008