Marcon, Margaret Angelina (CPSO#: 57559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Louisiana State in Shreveport, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
Division Of Gastroenterology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7735
Fax: (416) 813-6531
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 27 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET ANGELINA MARCON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1990