Marcotte, Mary Emily Rose (CPSO#: 95394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Department of Paediatrics
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

13278 Tecumseh Rd E
Suite 204
Tecumseh ON  N8N 0C2
Canada
Phone: 519-735-7715
Fax: 519-962-5974
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily Marcotte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Marcotte ( CPSO# 95394 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Department of Peadiatrics
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9

Business Address:
Suite 204
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 0C2
Phone Number: (519) 735-7715

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY EMILY ROSE MARCOTTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCOTTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2016 to 27 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2016