Marcu, Shai (CPSO#: 86044)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Feb 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Feb 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Mar 2007 to 27 May 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 28 May 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 01 Feb 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2009