Marcus, Alexander Thomas (CPSO#: 66788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Mary's Hospital
3830 Lacombe Avenue
Montreal QC  H3T 1M5
Phone: (514) 345-3511 Ext. 3180
Fax: (514) 734-2743

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER THOMAS MARCUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998