Maria, Moises Simoes (CPSO#: 93086)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 224-0910
Fax: (416) 800-5554
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Moises Maria Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Maria ( CPSO# 93086 )

Business Address:
Suite 304
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 427-6553

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 31 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOISES SIMOES MARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015