Marin Arellano, Alejandra Ines (CPSO#: 87052)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Pontificia Bolivariana, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East Wellington Family Health Team
Unit A
PO Box 340
175 Alma Street
Rockwood ON  N0B 2K0
Phone: 5198564681
Fax: 5198564612
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Marin Arellano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Marin Arellano ( CPSO# 87052 )

Business Address:
Unit A
175 Alma Street
P.O. Box 340
Rockwood ON  N0B 2K0
Phone Number: (519) 856-4611

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Colombia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEJANDRA INES MARIN ARELLANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARIN ARELLANO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2009