Marinosyan, Mari Hovsep (CPSO#: 90616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Armenian, Bulgarian, English

Education:Medical Academy Plovdiv, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
9080 Yonge street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone: (905) 597-2528
Fax: (905) 597-2536
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2044-2048 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M1R 1V2
Canada
Phone: 416-331-9111
Fax: 416-331-9050
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mari Marinosyan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Marinosyan ( CPSO# 90616 )

Business Address:
5 - 9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 6Z9
Phone Number: (905) 597-2528

Business Address:
2044-2048 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M1R 1V4
Phone Number: (416) 331-9111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARI HOVSEP MARINOSYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARINOSYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011