Marinov, Anton (CPSO#: 79687)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, German, Russian

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2863 Ellesmere Rd., Ste 110
Toronto ON  M1E4B9
Canada
Phone: 4162870990
Fax: 4162870992
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto General Hospital
Clinical Services Building
Ground Floor, Rm 405
200 Elizabeth St.
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 4131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anton Marinov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Marinov ( CPSO# 79687 )

Business Address:
710 Dorval Drive
Suite 202
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7

Business Address:
Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Clinical Services Building
Ground Floor Rm 405
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800


Corporation Name: Clarke/Katznelson/Marinov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Marinov ( CPSO# 79687 )
Dr. R. Katznelson ( CPSO# 78825 )
Dr. H. Clarke ( CPSO# 79400 )

Business Address:
110 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 3 EB 317
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
EN3 451-200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Ground Floor, Room 405
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800


Corporation Name: Drs. Clarke/Katznelson/Marinov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Marinov ( CPSO# 79687 )
Dr. R. Katznelson ( CPSO# 78825 )
Dr. H. Clarke ( CPSO# 79400 )

Business Address:
Suite 110
2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 287-0990

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTON MARINOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARINOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2008