Marion, Travis Emerson (CPSO#: 92998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Big Thunder Orthopedic Associates
984 Oliver Road, Suite 206
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: 807-344-1123 Ext. 5
Fax: 807-344-1166
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. E. Marion Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Marion ( CPSO# 92998 )

Business Address:
Big Thunder Orthopaedic Associates
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 344-1123

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRAVIS EMERSON MARION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARION is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2017