Marjerrison, Stacey Leah (CPSO#: 90272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Haematology/Oncology Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STACEY LEAH MARJERRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARJERRISON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Mar 2009 to 05 Apr 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2013