Markose, George (CPSO#: 94765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Jan 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Charing Cross Hospital Medical School, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS Henderson General Hospital
Department of Radiology
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Lower Level
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Canada
Phone: (905) 387-4551
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Main St. W.
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
237 Barton St. E.
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Norfolk General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
365 West St.
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T8
Canada
Phone: (519) 426-0130
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite#103
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 828-2066
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
169 Main Street E
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Canada
Phone: 9059452253
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Markose Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Markose ( CPSO# 94765 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 387-1966

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 5J5

Business Address:
Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 828-2966

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 18 Jan 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. George Markose may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Radiology,  McMaster  University,  in  which  Dr.  Markose holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of  Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Markose no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.