Marks De Chabris, Lionel (CPSO#: 59927)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#10 - 450 Notre Dame
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K8
Phone: (705) 673-1116
Fax: (705) 673-7267
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

680 Kirkwood Dr.
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Canada
Phone: (705) 675-9193 Ext. 8550
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

825 MCKINNON DR.
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Canada
Phone: (705) 869-1420 Ext. 3099
Fax: (705) 869-3081
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

#104-1012 Kelly Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5P4
Canada
Phone: (705) 670-9990
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

907 Lorne Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 4R6
Canada
Phone: 705-670-2000
Fax: 705-670-2006
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: 705-523-7100 Ext. 1875
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lionel Marks De Chabris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Marks De Chabris ( CPSO# 59927 )

Business Address:
104-1012 Kelly Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5P4
Phone Number: (705) 670-9990

Business Address:
907 Lorne Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 4R6
Phone Number: (705) 670-2000

Business Address:
109 Elm Street
Suite 102
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T4
Phone Number: (705) 670-2000

Business Address:
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone Number: (705) 675-9193

Business Address:
10 - 450 Notre Dame
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K8
Phone Number: (705) 673-1116

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
Espanola General Hospital
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P3E 1R4
Phone Number: (705) 869-1429

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIONEL MARKS DE CHABRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKS DE CHABRIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1989