Marquardt, Hans Roy (CPSO#: 67944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900 Ext. 71691
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marquardt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 17 2012


Corporation Name: Marquardt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 30 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANS ROY MARQUARDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARQUARDT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1996