Marqus, Sami Sabri (CPSO#: 73333)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Assyrian, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
109 A&B
1885 Glenanna Road
Pickering ON  L1V 6R6
Phone: 905 492 9100
Fax: 905 492 9101
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5995-14 th. AVE
Markham ON  L3R 0J2
Canada
Phone: 289 859 9901
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

3170 Eglinton AVE E
Scarborough ON  M1J 2H3
Canada
Phone: 416 265 2255
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sami Marqus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Marqus ( CPSO# 73333 )

Business Address:
Suite 109 A + B
1885 Glenanna Road
Pickering ON  L1V 6R6
Phone Number: (905) 492-9100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMI SABRI MARQUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARQUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 1999 to 31 May 1999
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2002