Marshall, Bryan Douglas (CPSO#: 65472)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7477 Highway 26
Stayner ON  L0M 1S0
Phone: (705) 428-3246
Fax: (705) 428-5652
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bryan Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Marshall ( CPSO# 65472 )

Business Address:
100B - 186 Erie Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 4T3
Phone Number: (705) 445-9711

Business Address:
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Business Address:
7477 Highway 26
Stayner ON  L0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 428-3246

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYAN DOUGLAS MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993