Marshall, Jonathan Terry (CPSO#: 94344)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:CHICAGO COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012