Marshall, Judith Andrea (CPSO#: 84735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lyndhurst Centre
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
University Health Network
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Mar 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH ANDREA MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 29 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2009