Marshall, Julia Lynne (CPSO#: 73678)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 11
6175 Dunn Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 2P4
Phone: (905) 356-0666
Fax: (905) 356-0902
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

397 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 528-9187
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

1101 University Ave
Windsor ON  N9A 5T1
Canada
Phone: (519) 252-0991
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

425 Wharncliffe Rd S
London ON  N6J 2M6
Canada
Phone: (519) 204-8430
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

570 King St
Unit 2B
Welland ON  L3B 3L2
Canada
Phone: (289) 820-8730
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

9917 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON  N8R 1A5
Canada
Phone: 5197356500
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J L Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Marshall ( CPSO# 73678 )

Business Address:
OATC
6119 Main Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 6A2
Phone Number: (905) 356-0666

Business Address:
OATC 397 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1J7
Phone Number: (905) 528-9989

Business Address:
OATC 1101 University Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 5T1
Phone Number: (519) 252-0991

Business Address:
425 Wharncliffe Road South
London ON  N6J 2M6
Phone Number: (519) 204-8430

Business Address:
601 Main Street
Welland ON  L3B 3Y3
Phone Number: (289) 820-7082

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA LYNNE MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001