Marszal, Maria Magdalena (CPSO#: 77236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Feb 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5E
210 Willmott Street
Cobourg ON  K9A 0E9
Phone: (905) 373-0728
Fax: (905) 373-1482
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Gate Oshawa outreach centre
394 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa ON  L1H 7L1
Canada
Phone: 905 432 5316
Fax: 866 691 8513
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maria Marszal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Marszal ( CPSO# 77236 )

Business Address:
Unit 5E
210 Willmott Street
Cobourg ON  K9A 0E9
Phone Number: (905) 373-0728

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Feb 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA MAGDALENA MARSZAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSZAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 07 Jan 2002 to 06 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 07 Jan 2003 to 12 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2003 to 12 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jan 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2004