Martel, Nadine Annette Nicole (CPSO#: 80360)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 21 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Mar 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Apr 2005