Martens, Benjamin Daniel (CPSO#: 96018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
P O Box 34
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone: (705) 658-4544
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Martens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Martens ( CPSO# 96018 )

Business Address:
Weeneebayko General Hospital
19 Hospital Drive
Box 34
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN DANIEL MARTENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Sep 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2013