Martin, Bruno Anthony Matthew (CPSO#: 75847)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Melbourne, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002