Martin, Danielle Alexa Shilton (CPSO#: 79000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6060
Fax: (416) 323-6485
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jul 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE ALEXA SHILTON MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2005