Martin, Ray Dennis (CPSO#: 28648)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 2221 Keele Street, Suite 108, Toronto M6M 3Z5
Date Received: 28 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018