Martinez Motta, Jose Carlos (CPSO#: 81827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Jun 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3E8
Phone: (519) 624-9796
Fax: (519) 624-0390
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Paediatrics
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-2330
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jose Carlos Martinez Motta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Martinez Motta ( CPSO# 81827 )

Business Address:
614 Coronation Boulevard
Unit 401
Cambridge ON  N1R 3E8

Business Address:
Department of Paediatrics
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 May 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Jun 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 May 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Jose  Carlos  Martinez  Motta  may  practice  medicine  independently  in
            Paediatrics, only.