Martinovic, Elaine Caroline (CPSO#: 76031)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Rm MG 130B
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 5862
Fax: (416) 480-5855
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. L. Milot ( CPSO# 86997 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862


Corporation Name: Dr. Elaine Martinovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG 130B
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE CAROLINE MARTINOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTINOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2006