Martinovic, Laurie Anne (CPSO#: 77011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare Services
Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: (905) 338-4146
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.A. Martinovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2008


Corporation Name: L.A. Martinovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Martinovic ( CPSO# 77011 )

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare Services
Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Mar 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURIE ANNE MARTINOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTINOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2001 to 10 Mar 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2002 to 09 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2003