Martins, Melissa Marie Massa (CPSO#: 110805)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saint James School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2016 to 11 Dec 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 18 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2018