Martou, Glykeria (CPSO#: 81423)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock St.
Brock 3
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2494
Fax: 613 544 3709
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Martou ( CPSO# 81423 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Brock 3
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7

Business Address:
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Greece

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 19 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLYKERIA MARTOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 28 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Jul 2011
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2010